HI SB396 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 192, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1306).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 192, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1306).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies public records by amending the procedure for clearing titles by adding a reference to recorded assignments of leases and rents for which the underlying debt has been fully paid or satisfied. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Security Interests In Real Property.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Act 192, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1306). |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Act 192, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1306). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 69) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 69). |
2017-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Takumi, Choy, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; S. Chang. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Takumi, Choy Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2017-04-07 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 460). |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1678), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola. |
2017-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-31-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from IAC/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1298) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ito, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Say. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Ito, Tokioka, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Onishi. |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC/CPC on Tuesday, 03-21-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to IAC/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 149) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 840) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-27-17 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 38) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB403 (Same As) 2017-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3).