HI SB393 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB393
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the removal or replacement of a director elected by a class of unit owners shall be by a majority of only the members of that class. Specifies that for an election in a mixed-use condominium project where directors are elected by different classes of owners, an association may cast a vote or votes allocated to any nonresidential unit owned by the association where those eligible to vote in the election are limited to owners of one or more nonresidential units, including the nonresidential unit owned by the association. (SB393 HD1)
Title
Relating To Condominiums.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1312) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-17 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Aquino, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2017-03-17 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 03-17-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 26 |
2017-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 33). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 560) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB393 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
HB648 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
HB648 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).