HI SB390 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act 153, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1255).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Department of Agriculture to create a dollar-for-dollar matching program for beneficiaries of the federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program to purchase Hawaii-grown produce. Appropriates funds. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program Incentives.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateAct 153, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1255).
2019-07-01HouseAct 153, on 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1255).
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 135) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 135).
2019-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakamura, Gates, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Gabbard, Moriwaki, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 2:20PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 3:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 3:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 3:00PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Ruderman Chair; Gabbard, Moriwaki Co-Chairs; Riviere, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: DeCoite, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Gates, Perruso, Okimoto.
2019-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
2019-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 658).
2019-04-05HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2125), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-29HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nishimoto, Todd.
2019-03-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3).
2019-03-19HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1423) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-15HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cachola, Onishi, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt.
2019-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-15-19 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 120) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1061) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-14-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-11SenateReported from HMS/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 180) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella.
2019-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on HMS/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 1:15PM in conference room 224.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to HMS/AEN, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB262 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback