HI SB387 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes conditions and time limits for placing a child in room confinement at a detention or shelter facility. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Room Confinement Of Children At Detention And Shelter Facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-03-25HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1495) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2021-03-23HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
2021-03-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
2021-03-19HouseReported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1039) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-03-16HouseThe committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
2021-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-16-21 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-09HouseReferred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 21
2021-03-09HousePass First Reading
2021-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 92) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-04SenateOne Day Notice 03-05-21.
2021-03-04SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 665) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-18SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-02-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-10SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 61) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-04-21 3:05PM in conference room 225.
2021-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 3:00PM in conference room 225.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to HMS, JDC.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB188 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback