HI SB387 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes HHFDC to assist DOE in developing teacher housing projects and contract or sponsor with any state department or agency. Appropriates funds for deposit into the Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund. Requires DOE to lease land and contract with private entities for the development, management, maintenance, or revitalization of teacher housing. Permits DOE to lease teacher housing to other eligible tenants if occupancy of teacher housing falls below 95 per cent. (SB387 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Teacher Rental Housing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from LHE/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1643) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, Johanson, Ohno, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka, Okimoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Quinlan.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE/HSG on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LHE/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 118) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 740) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-04SenateReported from HOU/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 22) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on HOU/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to HOU/EDU, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback