HI SB384 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of education to ensure that all traffic safety measures are in place and operational prior to the opening of a newly constructed public or charter school. Requires the same of private schools.
Title
Student Traffic Safety; New Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Referred to EDN, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 26 | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 37). | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Hemmings). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-02-25 | (S) One Day Notice 03-05-09. | |
2009-02-25 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2009-02-25 | (S) Reported from EDH/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 446) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Tsutsui, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH-TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-09 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to EDH/TIA. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |