HI SB382 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises appointment process for the Stadium Authority. Effective July 1, 2009. (SB382 HD2)
Title
Stadium Authority; Composition
Sponsors
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gary Hooser [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] | Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-04-29 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-09 2:00PM in conference room 423. | |
2009-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-09 2:00 PM in conference room 423. | |
2009-04-24 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-09 4:00 PM in conference room 423. | |
2009-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-09 4:00pm in conference room 423. | |
2009-04-22 | (S) The committee(s) on deleted the measure from the conference committee meeting scheduled on 04-24-09 3:30pm in conference room 423. | |
2009-04-22 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-09 10:30am in conference room 423. | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 655). | |
2009-04-20 | (H) House conferees appointed: Manahan, Ito Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Ching. | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653). | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 650). | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Fukunaga, Chair; Baker, Ige. | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Deferred until 04-16-09. | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 405). | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Finnegan, Marumoto, Pine voting no (3) and Representative(s) Berg, Herkes, Keith-Agaran, Morita, Takai, Tokioka excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-04-07 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-09-2009. | |
2009-04-07 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1578) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-03 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Har, Chang, Chong, Coffman, Herkes, Luke, Morita, Sagum, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, C. Lee. | |
2009-04-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 04-03-09 10:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLO with Representative(s) Finnegan, Marumoto, Thielen voting no (3) and Representative(s) Chang, Herkes, McKelvey, Pine, Takai, Tokioka excused (6). | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Reported from TCI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1243) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLO. | |
2009-03-23 | (H) The committees on TCI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Manahan, Tokioka, Choy, Evans, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marumoto; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, McKelvey, Wakai. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-23-09 10:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2009-03-16 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-23-09. | |
2009-03-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TCI on Monday, 03-16-09 8:30 AM in House conference room 312. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to TCI, WLO, referral sheet 28 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 145) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 550) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-03-02 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Ige; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Slom. | |
2009-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 03-02-09 1:15pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-25-09 1:15 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to EDT. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |