HI SB376 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a public school that has a career and technical education program to review all geographic exceptions applications and make a determination whether to allow students to enroll in career and technical education programs in schools outside the Department of Education service area in which the student resides. (SB376 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
2019-03-21HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1537) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-14HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson.
2019-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 03-14-19 2:30PM in House conference room 309.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-05HousePass First Reading
2019-03-01HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 18).
2019-03-01SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-01-19.
2019-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 804) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-13-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2019-02-06SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 67) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback