HI SB376 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes any employer to suspend or discharge an employee for good cause once the employee had completed the employer's probationary period of employment; requires written documentation be provided to the employee; defines "probationary period" to mean six months from the date of hire if an employer does not establish a specific probationary period at the date of hire.
Title
Employment Practices; Suspension and Discharge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to LBR. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=376&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB376_.HTM |