HI SB372 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB372

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires motor vehicle insurers to make satisfactory arrangements with the insurance commissioner to handle claims and service policies within the State. Specifies that motor vehicle insurers are required to maintain at least one physical sales and claims service office in each county. Requires the insurance commissioner to submit a report to the legislature, each year for five years, regarding any consumer complaints received as a result of changing the requirements for motor vehicle insurers to maintain a field presence in Hawaii. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. Repeals on 6/30/2022. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Motor Vehicle Insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-03-30HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2017-03-29HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2017-03-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-30-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2017-03-09HouseReferred to CPC, referral sheet 27
2017-03-09HousePass First Reading
2017-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 137) in amended form (SD 1).
2017-03-07SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-03-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
2017-03-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2017-03-03SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 698) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2017-02-27SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman.
2017-02-17SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-27-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2017-01-23SenateReferred to CPH.
2017-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB372 (Carry Over) 2017-03-30 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback