HI SB37 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB37
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the shipping container inspection program and appropriates funds for the shipping container inspection program. Requires the Department of Public Safety to submit reports to the Legislature on implementation of the shipping container inspection program. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Fireworks.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to TCA/PSM, WAM. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB809 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB37 (Carry Over) 2023-01-20 - Referred to TCA/PSM, WAM.
SB37 (Carry Over) 2023-01-20 - Referred to TCA/PSM, WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Public Safety
Department of Transportation
Fees
Illegal Fireworks
Shipping Container Inspection Program
Department of Public Safety
Department of Transportation
Fees
Illegal Fireworks
Shipping Container Inspection Program
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=37&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB37_.HTM |