HI SB37 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB37
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for operating expenses of the Hawaii state public library system. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Public Libraries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 442) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 3:30PM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to EDU. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 60) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to EDU. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU will hold a public decision making on 02-04-19 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB37 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.