HI SB360 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB360
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations, in consultation with the Insurance Commissioner, to develop a procedural manual to implement a family leave insurance program that pays family leave insurance benefits. Appropriates funds. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Family Leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-16 | House | The committee(s) on LGO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Thursday, 03-16-23 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 143) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 917) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from LBT/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 426) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS deferred the measure until 02-15-23 1:00PM; CR 225. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee, Ihara, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 3:10PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to LBT/HHS, WAM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB360 (Carry Over) 2023-03-16 - The committee(s) on LGO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB236 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB236 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
DLIR
Family Leave
Family Leave Insurance Program
Insurance Commissioner
Positions
Procedural Manual
DLIR
Family Leave
Family Leave Insurance Program
Insurance Commissioner
Positions
Procedural Manual