HI SB356 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB356

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires homeowners insurers to provide written and oral disclosure to an insured regarding the natural disaster perils not covered by the insured's homeowners insurance policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee on CPH deferred the measure.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-28SenateRe-Referred to CPH.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to HOU, CPH.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB356 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback