HI SB351 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB351
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the statutory requirement for the Environmental Council to prepare an annual report by January 31 of each year. Repeals the requirement that allows for hearing appeals from applicant actions where an environmental impact statement was not accepted by the accepting authority. Deletes references to the University of Hawaii Environmental Center. Limits contestable issues for appeal. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Environmental Impact Statements.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 27) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to AEN, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB351 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.