HI SB35 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB35
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to establish a pilot safe space program for alternative learning center program students in the department of education. Effective 7/1/2051. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments And Be Recommitted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments And Be Recommitted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2020-05-11 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1150-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Quinlan, DeCoite, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, D. Kobayashi. |
2020-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 03-12-20 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 64) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from EDU/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3033) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-20 2:00PM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU/WAM. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to EDU. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2899) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to EDU. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Dela Cruz. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU will hold a public decision making on 02-18-20 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB35 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Referred to EDU.
Subjects
Alternative Learning Centers
Appropriation ($)
Department of Education
Department of Human Services
Emergency Crisis Services
Appropriation ($)
Department of Education
Department of Human Services
Emergency Crisis Services