HI SB349 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB349
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the nominated members of certain boards and commission are subject to the advice and consent of the Senate Standing Committee on Government Operations. Effective 7/1/2112. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Boards And Commissions.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-24 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 366) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-23 3:15PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB349 (Carry Over) 2023-02-24 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Subjects
Advice and Consent
Commission on Fatherhood
Commission to Promote Uniform Legislation
Statewide Voters with Special Needs Advisory Board
Commission on Fatherhood
Commission to Promote Uniform Legislation
Statewide Voters with Special Needs Advisory Board