HI SB34 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB34
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a temporary income tax credit for taxpayers who sell real property to owner-occupants. Takes effect 03/22/2075. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 471) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft). |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB34 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.