HI SB3379 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-29 - Referred to AEN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-29 - Referred to AEN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for food bank purchase from local farmers, to be expended by request for proposal via the Department of Agriculture.
Title
Relating To Food Security.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2590 (Same As) 2024-03-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3379&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB3379_.HTM |