HI SB3329 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-28 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-28 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the disclosure of any little fire ant infestation as part of any sale of residential real property. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Little Fire Ants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4). |
2024-03-19 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1194-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-03-13 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Woodson, Ward. |
2024-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-13-24 8:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 46) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-24. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2770) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-20-24 9:35AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2534) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-09-24 1:06PM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPN. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |