HI SB3314 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to EEP/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to EEP/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers the Hawaii State Energy Office from the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to the Department of Land and Natural Resources as an administratively attached agency. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii State Energy Office.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to EEP/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 511) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara, Moriwaki. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Fevella, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2900) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported from EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2365) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-22 3:10PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EET/WTL, WAM. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |