HI SB33 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB33
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each county to prepare a housing supply plan to plan for projected increases in the State's housing supply to meet housing demands of the respective county, identify and analyze existing and projected housing needs for all income levels, define the term "housing demand" including a ratio of jobs to residents to account for latent demand, and identify adequate sites for housing, including rental housing. Requires housing supply plans to be submitted to the legislature. Appropriates funds for the counties to conduct the required studies.
Title
Relating To Housing Supply Plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 520) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM/EET, WAM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB33 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.