HI SB33 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 275, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1395).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 275, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1395).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the annual rolling cap for the Motion Picture, Digital Media, and Film Production Income Tax Credit. Requires the University of Hawaii, West Oahu campus and HTDC to execute a memorandum of understanding that commits the parties to enter into a no-cost lease agreement for at least 60 years that includes a provision for the transfer of title within 6 years to a certain parcel of land from the University of Hawaii, West Oahu campus to HTDC. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Economic Development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 275, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1395). |
2019-07-12 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 275, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1395). |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-19 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202) |
2019-06-24 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1202) |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 172) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 172). |
2019-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Cullen, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Kidani, Dela Cruz, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 4:00PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 4:00PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 4:00PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 849). |
2019-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Woodson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2019-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901). |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Kidani, Dela Cruz, Kim Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 640). |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-05-19. |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1990) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Holt, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, McDermott. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from EDB/LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1687) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-13 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Johanson, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso, D. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Quinlan. |
2019-03-13 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-03-11 | House | Re-referred to EDB/LHE, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB/LHE on Wednesday, 03-13-19 9:50AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to EDB/LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 37) in amended form (SD 3). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1193) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 466) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 3:15PM in conference room 414. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to EET. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 49) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to EET. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET will hold a public decision making on 02-04-19 3:15PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to EET. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Annual Cap
Economic Development
HTDC
Motion Picture, Digital Media, and Film Production Income Tax Credit
University of Hawaii West Oahu Campus
Economic Development
HTDC
Motion Picture, Digital Media, and Film Production Income Tax Credit
University of Hawaii West Oahu Campus