HI SB3280 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-29 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-29 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the amounts for the income tax brackets and personal exemption and standard deduction amounts for tax year 2024. Adjusts annually for tax years beginning after 12/31/2024, the income tax brackets and personal exemption, and standard deduction amounts by a cost-of-living adjustment factor. Amends the taxable income brackets and income tax rates for each filing status for taxable years beginning after 12/31/2023. Defines "cost-of-living adjustment factor".
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Amount
Cost-of-living Adjustment
Earned Income Tax Credit
Income Tax
Income Tax Brackets
Personal Exemption
Standard Deduction
Cost-of-living Adjustment
Earned Income Tax Credit
Income Tax
Income Tax Brackets
Personal Exemption
Standard Deduction
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3280&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB3280_.HTM |