HI SB328 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB328
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-25 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-25 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinstates provisions, repealed on June 30, 2020, relating to service of process and requiring the director public safety to maintain a list of independent civil process servers. Authorizes the use of policer officers and independent civil process servers to process orders and writs for certain causes of action.
Title
Relating To Service Of Process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB328 (Carry Over) 2021-01-25 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
HB275 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
HB275 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=328&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB328_.HTM |