HI SB328 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB328
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to amend the timeframe to renew the term of office of a justice or judge and require consent of the senate for a justice or judge to renew a term of office.
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article Vi, Section 3, Of The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii To Amend The Timeframe To Renew The Term Of Office Of A Justice Or Judge And Require Consent Of The Senate For A Justice Or Judge To Renew A Term Of Office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1186 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB328 (Carry Over) 2017-02-08 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
SB328 (Carry Over) 2017-02-08 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Subjects
Constitutional Amendment (ConAm)
Judicial Selection Commission
Justices and Judges
Senate Consent
Term Renewals
Judicial Selection Commission
Justices and Judges
Senate Consent
Term Renewals
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=328&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB328_.HTM |