HI SB328 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 206, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 206, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Residential Landlord-tenant Code to provide for security deposits that include an additional amount to pay for damages caused by any pet animal, other than an assistance animal, allowed to reside in the premises pursuant to the rental agreement. Effective for rental agreements entered into on or after 11/01/2013. (CD1)
Title
Residential Landlord-tenant Code; Security Deposit; Animals; Pet Animals
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act 206, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309). |
2013-07-02 | House | Act 206, on 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309). |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 749). |
2013-04-25 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 747). |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Har voting no (2) and Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen excused (2). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Nishihara. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-25-13. |
2013-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-25-13. |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 5) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 5). |
2013-04-18 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Rhoads, Brower, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-18-13 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-13 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Brower, Thielen. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Galuteria, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 515). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1614) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1173) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-03-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Har. |
2013-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-13. |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-18-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-11 | House | Re-referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 34 |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to CPC/JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2013-02-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-02-11 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 12) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-11-13. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 124) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |