HI SB3258 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the auditor to conduct a comprehensive study of managed care organizations that administer the medicaid program in the State.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HMS/GVO, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2032 (Same As) 2022-02-03 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3258&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB3258_.HTM |