HI SB3247 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 1:50PM; Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 1:50PM; Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DHHL to develop a strategic plan to meet certain housing preferences of individuals on the DHHL applicant waiting list. Requires DHHL to submit the strategic plan to the legislature no later than 12/10/2022. Effective 1/1/2222. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Hawaiian Home Lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 1:50PM; Conference Room 325. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-22 1:50PM; Conference Room 325. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakamura, Nakashima, Ilagan Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, McDermott. |
2022-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; DeCoite, Fevella. |
2022-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1977-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-06 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-04-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1350-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-03-22 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi. |
2022-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-22-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-18 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1162-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-03-17 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Clark, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, McDermott. |
2022-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-17-22 9:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HSG, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 489) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3111) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi, Fevella. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-03-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2154) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-22 1:01PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |