HI SB324 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Act 097, on 06/25/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1199).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Act 097, on 06/25/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1199).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the definition of the practice of medicine to provide uniformity of practice for both medical physicians and osteopathic physicians. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Practice Of Medicine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | House | Act 097, on 06/25/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1199). |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Act 097, 06/25/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1199). |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 146) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 146). |
2021-04-21 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Johanson, Tam, Har, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 2:10PM; CR 329. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 808). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Johanson, Tam Co-Chairs; Har, Ward. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2021-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 405). |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1676), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1489), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-24 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1041) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2021-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-16-21 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2021-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 85) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 626) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 151) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |