HI SB3237 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the investigative power of the Department of Human Services to include: children who have been adopted or have been placed in legal guardianship, whose adoptive families or legal guardians are receiving federal or state financial assistance; and children in the foster care system for whom there is a pending petition for adoption or for whom an adoption decree has been issued but the children have not yet been placed in the custody of the adoption petitioner. Requires the Department of Human Services to submit a report to the Legislature on the impact of expanding home visits to families receiving adoption assistance or legal guardianship assistance before the convening of the Regular Session of 2027. Establishes a two-year Crisis Mobile Outreach Team Pilot Program within the Department of Health to expand and support existing crisis response services and programs for at-risk youth. Requires the Department of Health's Child and Adolescent Mental Health Division to submit a report to the Legislature on its findings and recommendations arising from the pilot program before the Regular Session of 2024. Appropriates funds to the Department of Health and the Department of Human Services. Repeals the pilot program on 6/30/2024. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Child Welfare Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 487) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3176) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-02-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2216) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM/JDC. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2424 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1216)
Subjects
Adoption
Adoption Assistance
Appropriation ($)
Crisis Mobile Outreach Team Pilot Program
DHS
DOH
Foster Care
Investigation
Adoption Assistance
Appropriation ($)
Crisis Mobile Outreach Team Pilot Program
DHS
DOH
Foster Care
Investigation