HI SB3225 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the dam and spillway loan and grant programs for plans, design, construction, and equipment that is used to improve deficient dams and spillways as determined by the Department of Land and Natural Resources and approved by the Board of Land and Natural Resources. Specifies eligibility requirements for dam and spillway improvement grants. Establishes the dam and spillway improvement tax credit for expenditures for dam and spillway improvements that bring dams and spillways up to code. Appropriates funds. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Dam And Reservoir Safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-15-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 482) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WTL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2978) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-03-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft). |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL/WAM. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2237 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3