HI SB3208 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "preceptor" and "volunteer-based supervised clinical training rotation" to improve accessibility for providers to receive income tax credits for acting as preceptors. Includes the Director of Health on the Preceptor Credit Assurance Committee. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Healthcare Preceptors.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 478) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2988) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2641) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH, CPN/WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1975 (Same As) 2022-02-24 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.