HI SB3183 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Director of Transportation to establish and implement a digital identification pilot program. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Digital Identification.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 465) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3175) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-02-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from TRS/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2519) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, DeCoite, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/GVO deferred the measure until 02-10-22 3:15PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 3:15PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS/GVO, WAM/JDC. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to TRS/GVO, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1686 (Same As) 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
Subjects
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Department of Human Services
Department of the Attorney General
Department of Transportation
Digital Identification
Hawaii Tourism Authority
Pilot Program
Department of Human Services
Department of the Attorney General
Department of Transportation
Digital Identification
Hawaii Tourism Authority
Pilot Program