HI SB3180 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to TCA, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to TCA, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends sections 286-234 and 286-249, HRS, to adopt federal penalties for commercial driver's license violations.
Title
Relating To Commercial Driver's Licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to TCA, JDC. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2491 (Same As) 2024-07-02 - Act 135, 07/01/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3180&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB3180_.HTM |