HI SB318 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for custodial and maintenance staff at the University of Hawaii at Hilo.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making An Appropriation To The University Of Hawaii At Hilo.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 95).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01SenateOne Day Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1133) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2019-02-08SenateReported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 147) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 2:50PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to HRE, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback