HI SB318 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB318
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for custodial and maintenance staff at the University of Hawaii at Hilo.
Title
Making An Appropriation To The University Of Hawaii At Hilo.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 95). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1133) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 147) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB318 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=318&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB318_.HTM |