HI SB3175 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 8:30AM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 8:30AM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the state health insurance assistance program. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The State Health Insurance Assistance Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-17-20 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 516) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3016) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-25-20 12:25PM in conference room 211. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |