HI SB3173 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the minimum and potential maximum fine for violating Hawaii Revised Statutes sections 291-22, 291-24, and 291-24.5, which prohibit the installation and sale of noisy mufflers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseReferred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 515).
2020-03-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3130) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
2020-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:00PM in conference room 016.
2020-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2020-02-12SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2539) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2020-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella.
2020-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-20 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2020-01-27SenateReferred to TRS, JDC.
2020-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback