HI SB3173 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the minimum and potential maximum fine for violating Hawaii Revised Statutes sections 291-22, 291-24, and 291-24.5, which prohibit the installation and sale of noisy mufflers.
Title
Relating To Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 515). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3130) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:00PM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2539) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |