HI SB317 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB317

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes provisions relating to the Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact to facilitate interstate practice of audiology and speech-language pathology. Requires the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to adopt rules to implement and administer the Compact. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Audiology And Speech-language Pathology Interstate Compact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-22SenateThe committee on CPN deferred the measure.
2023-02-17SenateThe committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
2023-02-17SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
2023-02-17SenateReported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 485) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
2023-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
2023-01-25SenateReferred to HHS, CPN.
2023-01-19SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB317 (Carry Over) 2023-02-22 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback