HI SB3167 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals and reestablishes the stadium development district under the jurisdiction of the stadium authority. Establishes the stadium development special fund. Expands the powers and duties of the stadium authority. Appropriates funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Stadium Development District.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05SenateThe committee on WTL deferred the measure.
2020-02-05SenateThe committee on EET deferred the measure.
2020-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-20 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2020-01-27SenateReferred to EET/WTL, WAM.
2020-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2520 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback