HI SB3166 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds two more members to the Stadium Authority that shall consist of a resident of Aiea or Halawa and a resident of Alii Plantation, Crosspointe, or Foster Village. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Stadium Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2522) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Fevella. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-20 2:55PM in conference room 414. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2217 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.