HI SB3165 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires passenger vehicles to be tested for emissions as part of the required yearly inspection, excepting those vehicles manufactured prior to 1975 and within the preceding five years.
Title
Relating To Automobiles.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3165&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB3165_.HTM |