HI SB3161 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes certain state grant-in-aid recipients to request certain amendments to grants-in-aid contracts during governor-declared states of emergency. Authorizes the governor to release qualified state workers to serve in community-based disaster relief networks during and in anticipation of governor-declared states of emergency. Appropriates moneys.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Social Infrastructure For Community Problem-solving.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06SenateThe committee on PSM deferred the measure.
2020-02-06SenateThe committee on GVO deferred the measure.
2020-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on PSM/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-20 2:45PM in conference room 225.
2020-01-27SenateReferred to PSM/GVO, WAM.
2020-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback