HI SB3156 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - The committee on HRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - The committee on HRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To recognize the cost-sharing agreement for overall personnel expenses between State general funds and funds in the University of Hawaii Tuition and Fees Special Fund for appropriated general fund positions as beneficial to both the University of Hawaii and the State. Specifies conditions for exemptions for the University of Hawaii from sections 87A-39(a) and 88-125(a), Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii Tuition And Fees Special Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee on HRE deferred the measure. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE deferred the measure until 02-08-22 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2188 (Same As) 2022-03-11 - Referred to HRE, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3156&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB3156_.HTM |