HI SB3155 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the number of terms that should expire each year from three to two. Adjusts the terms of Board of Regents members appointed between 2022-2026 to realign the number of terms scheduled to expire each year. Reduces the number of board members from eleven to nine. Amends the board composition to require four members representing each of the four major counties and five at-large members. Requires two at-large members to be selected from three names submitted by the Speaker of the House of Representatives and President of the Senate, respectively, to the Governor. Requires one at-large member to be selected by the Governor. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii Board Of Regents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2665) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HRE, JDC. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2187 (Same As) 2022-02-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).