HI SB3154 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires verification that an applicant for a tour aircraft permit fitted their aircraft with Federal Aviation Administration approved flotation equipment. Requires verification that an applicant for a tour aircraft permit equipped their aircraft with and uses during operation an automatic dependent surveillance-broadcast system. Requires tour aircraft operators to comply with the National Transportation Safety Board safety recommendations. Prohibits any tour aircraft operator from operating an aircraft near a residential property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Tour Aircrafts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03SenateThe committee on TRS deferred the measure.
2020-02-03SenateThe committee on EET deferred the measure.
2020-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on TRS/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-20 1:16PM in conference room 225.
2020-01-27SenateReferred to TRS/EET, JDC.
2020-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback