HI SB3153 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Beginning 12/31/2025, prohibits the confinement of specified farm animals in a cruel manner and prohibits business owners and operators from selling certain products made from those animals. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Animal Cruelty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseReferred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 510) in amended form (SD 2).
2020-03-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3275) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-02-27SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2020-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-20 10:30AM in conference room 016.
2020-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2020-02-14SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2788) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2020-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen.
2020-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-20 1:30PM in conference room 224.
2020-01-27SenateReferred to AEN, JDC.
2020-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2569 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-05-20 8:35AM in conference room 312.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback