HI SB315 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB315
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys for the State of Hawaii Museum of Natural and Cultural History from the funds received by the State from the American Rescue Plan Act of 2021, Public Law 117-2. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The State Of Hawaii Museum Of Natural And Cultural History.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1374) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-24 | House | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Tam, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-24-21 11:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 20 |
2021-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 71) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-21. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 604) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-21 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB315 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).